AL HB442 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 30 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-06 - Pending third reading on day 29 Favorable from Education Policy
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 30 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-06 - Pending third reading on day 29 Favorable from Education Policy
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Education, public K-12 schools, school sports, requires public K-12 schools and local boards of education to accept certain forms of payments for admission to school sporting events
Title
Education, public K-12 schools, school sports, requires public K-12 schools and local boards of education to accept certain forms of payments for admission to school sporting events
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-30 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 772 (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-03-30 - House - Motion to Adopt Roll Call 771 (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-03-30 - House - HBIR: Hurst motion to Adopt Roll Call 770 (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-03-30 - House - Motion to Adopt Roll Call 771 (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-03-30 - House - HBIR: Hurst motion to Adopt Roll Call 770 (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-06 | Senate | Pending third reading on day 29 Favorable from Education Policy |
2022-04-06 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2022-03-30 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Education Policy |
2022-03-30 | House | Engrossed |
2022-03-30 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 772 |
2022-03-30 | House | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 771 |
2022-03-30 | House | Hurst Amendment Offered |
2022-03-30 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2022-03-17 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2022-03-03 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Education Policy |