AL HB442 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 21 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-21 - Pending third reading on day 28 Favorable from Governmental Affairs
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 21 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-21 - Pending third reading on day 28 Favorable from Governmental Affairs
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Women's commission, quorum for holding meetings and conducting business, Sec. 41-9-410 am'd.
Title
Women's commission, quorum for holding meetings and conducting business, Sec. 41-9-410 am'd.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-05-21 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-21 | Senate | Pending third reading on day 28 Favorable from Governmental Affairs |
2015-05-21 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Governmental Affairs |
2015-06-02 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2015-05-21 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 974 |
2015-05-21 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2015-04-30 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2015-04-09 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Boards, Agencies and Commissions |