AL HB441 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 1 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-21 - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass lost Roll Call 1163
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 1 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-21 - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass lost Roll Call 1163
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Criminal sentencing, suspended sentences, split sentences, consecutive incarcerations prohibited, maximum probation, defendant not eligible for good time or parole, probationary sentences subject to modification, order regarding substance abuse treatment and full credit for treatment, Secs. 15-18-8, 15-22-54 am'd.
Title
Criminal sentencing, suspended sentences, split sentences, consecutive incarcerations prohibited, maximum probation, defendant not eligible for good time or parole, probationary sentences subject to modification, order regarding substance abuse treatment and full credit for treatment, Secs. 15-18-8, 15-22-54 am'd.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-21 | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass lost Roll Call 1163 | |
2010-04-21 | Lost in second house | |
2010-04-14 | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar | |
2010-04-06 | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Judiciary | |
2010-04-01 | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 790 | |
2010-04-01 | Third Reading Passed | |
2010-02-11 | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar | |
2010-01-26 | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Judiciary |