AL HB440 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 9 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-18 - Read for the Second Time and placed on the Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 9 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-18 - Read for the Second Time and placed on the Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
ERS, benefit increase for certain retirees of on October 1, 2024
Title
ERS, benefit increase for certain retirees of on October 1, 2024
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-18 | House | Read for the Second Time and placed on the Calendar |
2024-04-17 | House | Reported Out of Committee House of Origin |
2024-04-09 | House | Pending House Ways and Means General Fund |
2024-04-09 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means General Fund |