AL HB44 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 30 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-03 - Further Consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on January 30 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-03 - Further Consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Motor vehicles, farm tags for truck tractors, provision limiting a farmer to one farm tag for truck tractors deleted, Sec. 40-12-248 am'd.
Title
Motor vehicles, farm tags for truck tractors, provision limiting a farmer to one farm tag for truck tractors deleted, Sec. 40-12-248 am'd.
Sponsors
Rep. Alan Boothe [R] |
Roll Calls
2014-01-30 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 83 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 19) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-03 | Senate | Further Consideration |
2014-04-03 | Senate | Marsh motion to Carry Over adopted Voice Vote |
2014-04-03 | Senate | Dial motion to Table adopted Voice Vote |
2014-04-03 | Senate | Pittman Amendment Offered |
2014-04-03 | Senate | Third Reading Carried Over |
2014-02-12 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2014-02-04 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Commerce, Transportation, and Utilities |
2014-01-30 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 79 |
2014-01-30 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2014-01-15 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2014-01-14 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Public Safety and Homeland Security |