AL HB439 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 2 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-02 - Delivered to Governor at 2:21 p.m. on May 2, 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 2 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-02 - Delivered to Governor at 2:21 p.m. on May 2, 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Pickens Co., courts costs, service of process fee for personal service by sheriff for actions outside of this state
Title
Pickens Co., courts costs, service of process fee for personal service by sheriff for actions outside of this state
Sponsors
Rep. Alan Harper [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-04-27 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2017-04-11 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 81 Abs: 9) [FAIL]
2017-04-11 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 81 Abs: 9) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-02 | House | Delivered to Governor at 2:21 p.m. on May 2, 2017. |
2017-05-02 | House | Assigned Act No. 2017-253. |
2017-05-02 | House | Clerk of the House Certification |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Signature Requested |
2017-04-27 | House | Enrolled |
2017-04-27 | House | Passed Second House |
2017-04-27 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 797 |
2017-04-27 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2017-04-13 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Local Legislation |
2017-04-11 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 467 |
2017-04-11 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2017-04-06 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2017-04-04 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Local Legislation |