AL HB439 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 9 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-28 - Carns motion to Indefinitely Postpone adopted Voice Vote
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 9 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-28 - Carns motion to Indefinitely Postpone adopted Voice Vote
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Jefferson Co., civic center authority, board members, appointments by Jefferson Co. Legislative Delegation, procedures, Act 547, 1965 Reg. Sess., am'd.
Title
Jefferson Co., civic center authority, board members, appointments by Jefferson Co. Legislative Delegation, procedures, Act 547, 1965 Reg. Sess., am'd.
Sponsors
Rep. Jim Carns [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-28 | House | Carns motion to Indefinitely Postpone adopted Voice Vote |
2015-05-28 | House | Third Reading Indefinitely Postponed |
2015-05-26 | House | Carns motion to Carry Over Temporarily adopted Voice Vote |
2015-05-26 | House | Third Reading Carried Over |
2015-04-16 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2015-04-09 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Jefferson County Legislation |