AL HB439 | 2013 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 20 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-20 - Forwarded to Governor on May 20, 2013 at 6:45 p.m. on May 20, 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Montgomery, housing authority, personnnel merit system, and Personnel Appeals Board, membership, duties, and powers

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Montgomery, housing authority, personnnel merit system, and Personnel Appeals Board, membership, duties, and powers

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2013-05-22 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2013-05-09 - Senate - Dial table Dial motion to recommit (Y: 16 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2013-05-02 - Senate - Bussman motion table Smitherman motion to rerefer (Y: 17 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2013-04-16 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 36 Abs: 16) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2013-05-20HouseForwarded to Governor on May 20, 2013 at 6:45 p.m. on May 20, 2013.
2013-05-20HouseAssigned Act No. 2013-326.
2013-05-20HouseClerk of the House Certification
2013-05-20HouseEnrolled
2013-05-20SenateSignature Requested
2013-05-20HousePassed Second House
2013-05-20SenateMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1066
2013-05-20SenateThird Reading Passed
2013-05-09SenateDial table Dial motion to recommit adopted Roll Call 950
2013-05-09SenateRead for the second time and placed on the calendar
2013-05-02SenateBussman motion table Smitherman motion to rerefer adopted Roll Call 691
2013-05-02SenateSmitherman motion to rerefer
2013-05-02SenateRead for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Local Legislation No. 1
2013-04-16HouseMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 447
2013-04-16HouseThird Reading Passed
2013-04-02HouseRead for the second time and placed on the calendar
2013-03-20HouseRead for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Montgomery County Legislation

Subjects


Alabama State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/SESSBillResult.ASPX?WIN_TYPE=BillResult&BILL=HB439
Texthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2013RS/PrintFiles/HB439-int.pdf
Texthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2013RS/PrintFiles/HB439-enr.pdf
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=465264&VOTE=447&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1061&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=471947&VOTE=691&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1061&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=474806&VOTE=950&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1061&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=475864&VOTE=1066&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1061&AMDSUB= 

Bill Comments

feedback