AL HB438 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 16 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-05-02 - Smitherman motion to Rerefer a Bill adopted Voice Vote
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 16 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-05-02 - Smitherman motion to Rerefer a Bill adopted Voice Vote
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Class 3 municipalities, authorize mayor to appoint a deputy mayor, approved by majority of council, salary, Act 618, 1973 Reg. Sess., am'd.
Title
Class 3 municipalities, authorize mayor to appoint a deputy mayor, approved by majority of council, salary, Act 618, 1973 Reg. Sess., am'd.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-05-02 - Senate - Bussman motion to table Smitherman motion to rerefer (Y: 6 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [FAIL]
2013-04-16 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 33 Abs: 19) [PASS]
2013-04-16 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 32 Abs: 20) [PASS]
2013-04-16 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 33 Abs: 19) [PASS]
2013-04-16 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 32 Abs: 20) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-02 | Senate | Smitherman motion to Rerefer a Bill adopted Voice Vote |
2013-05-02 | Senate | Bussman motion to table Smitherman motion to rerefer lost Roll Call 690 |
2013-05-02 | Senate | Smitherman motion to rerefer |
2013-05-02 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Local Legislation No. 1 |
2013-04-16 | House | Engrossed |
2013-04-16 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 445 |
2013-04-16 | House | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 444 |
2013-04-16 | House | Montgomery County Legislation Amendment Offered |
2013-04-16 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2013-04-02 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment |
2013-03-20 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Montgomery County Legislation |