AL HB437 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 2 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-02 - Delivered to Governor at 11:45 p.m. on June 2, 2011.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 2 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-02 - Delivered to Governor at 11:45 p.m. on June 2, 2011.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Governor's Mansion Authority, established, members, duties, funding, employees, Governor's Mansion Advisory Board abolished, Secs. 41-9-530 to 41-9-532, inclusive, repealed
Title
Governor's Mansion Authority, established, members, duties, funding, employees, Governor's Mansion Advisory Board abolished, Secs. 41-9-530 to 41-9-532, inclusive, repealed
Sponsors
Rep. Jeremy Oden [R] |
Roll Calls
2011-06-02 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-05-05 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2011-05-05 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2011-05-05 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2011-05-05 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-02 | Delivered to Governor at 11:45 p.m. on June 2, 2011. | |
2011-06-02 | Assigned Act No. 2011-568. | |
2011-06-02 | Clerk of the House Certification | |
2011-06-02 | Signature Requested | |
2011-06-02 | Enrolled | |
2011-06-02 | Passed Second House | |
2011-06-02 | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1039 | |
2011-06-02 | Third Reading Passed | |
2011-05-25 | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar | |
2011-05-24 | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Governmental Affairs | |
2011-05-05 | Engrossed | |
2011-05-05 | Mitchell intended to vote "Yea" | |
2011-05-05 | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 702 | |
2011-05-05 | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 701 | |
2011-05-05 | State Government Amendment Offered | |
2011-05-05 | Third Reading Passed | |
2011-04-14 | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment | |
2011-04-05 | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on State Government |