AL HB436 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 20 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-20 - Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Ways and Means Education
Pending: House Ways and Means Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 20 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-20 - Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Ways and Means Education
Pending: House Ways and Means Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Taxation, income tax credit, against tax liability for the rehabilitation, preservation, or development of structures near certain higher education institutions, Historic University Neighborhood Rehabilitation Act
Title
Taxation, income tax credit, against tax liability for the rehabilitation, preservation, or development of structures near certain higher education institutions, Historic University Neighborhood Rehabilitation Act
Sponsors
Rep. Laura Hall [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-02-06 - Senate - Chambliss motion to Concur In and Adopt (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2018-02-06 - House - Johnson (R) motion to Concur In and Adopt (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 31 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2018-01-25 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2018-01-16 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 45 Abs: 37) [FAIL]
2018-02-06 - House - Johnson (R) motion to Concur In and Adopt (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 31 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2018-01-25 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2018-01-16 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 45 Abs: 37) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-20 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Ways and Means Education |