AL HB436 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 19 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-19 - Forwarded to Governor on April 19, 2016 at 4:46 p.m. on April 19, 2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 19 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-19 - Forwarded to Governor on April 19, 2016 at 4:46 p.m. on April 19, 2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Blount Co., co. commission, sales and use tax, additional, distribution, referendum
Title
Blount Co., co. commission, sales and use tax, additional, distribution, referendum
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-04-19 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2016-04-05 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 70 Abs: 13) [FAIL]
2016-04-05 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 70 Abs: 13) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-19 | House | Forwarded to Governor on April 19, 2016 at 4:46 p.m. on April 19, 2016. |
2016-04-19 | House | Assigned Act No. 2016-196. |
2016-04-19 | House | Clerk of the House Certification |
2016-04-19 | House | Enrolled |
2016-04-19 | Senate | Signature Requested |
2016-04-19 | House | Passed Second House |
2016-04-19 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 621 |
2016-04-19 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2016-04-12 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2016-04-05 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Local Legislation |
2016-04-05 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 482 |
2016-04-05 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2016-03-23 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2016-03-17 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Local Legislation |