AL HB433 | 2023 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 3 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-05-31 - Indefinitely Postpone
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Relating to Opioid Addiction Treatment; to repeal the Medication Assisted Treatment of Opioid Use Act of 2019, codified as Sections 20-2-300 through 20-2-302, Code of Alabama 1975, that provide for adoption of rules governing use of buprenorphine in the treatment of opioid addiction and a standing working group to assist in drafting the rules.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to Opioid Addiction Treatment; to repeal the Medication Assisted Treatment of Opioid Use Act of 2019, codified as Sections 20-2-300 through 20-2-302, Code of Alabama 1975, that provide for adoption of rules governing use of buprenorphine in the treatment of opioid addiction and a standing working group to assist in drafting the rules.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2023-05-31HouseIndefinitely Postpone
2023-05-18HouseSubstitute a Companion Bill
2023-05-18HouseOn Third Reading in House of Origin
2023-05-11HouseRead Second Time in House of Origin
2023-05-10HouseReported Out of Committee in House of Origin
2023-05-10HouseReported Favorably from House Health
2023-05-03HouseIntroduced and Referred to House Health
2023-05-03HouseRead First Time in House of Origin

Subjects


Alabama State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback