AL HB433 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-27 - Pending third reading on day 25 Favorable from Local Legislation
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-27 - Pending third reading on day 25 Favorable from Local Legislation
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Foley, corp. limits alt.
Title
Foley, corp. limits alt.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-06 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 64 Abs: 12) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-27 | Senate | Pending third reading on day 25 Favorable from Local Legislation |
2018-03-27 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Local Legislation |
2018-03-06 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 591 |
2018-03-06 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2018-03-01 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2018-02-20 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Baldwin County Legislation |