AL HB433 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 26 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-06-04 - Pending third reading on day 30 Favorable from Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 26 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-06-04 - Pending third reading on day 30 Favorable from Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Human Trafficking Safe Harbor Act, crimes of prostitution, sexually exploited children, conviction or delinquency adjudication of prostitution prohibited under certain conditions, retention of jurisdiction by juvenile court, additional fines, counseling required, detention of foreign nationals under certain conditions, Sec. 13A-12-123 added
Title
Human Trafficking Safe Harbor Act, crimes of prostitution, sexually exploited children, conviction or delinquency adjudication of prostitution prohibited under certain conditions, retention of jurisdiction by juvenile court, additional fines, counseling required, detention of foreign nationals under certain conditions, Sec. 13A-12-123 added
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-05-26 - House - Cosponsors Added (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 45) [PASS]
2015-05-26 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2015-05-26 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2015-05-26 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2015-05-26 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-04 | Senate | Pending third reading on day 30 Favorable from Judiciary |
2015-06-04 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2015-05-28 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Judiciary |
2015-05-26 | House | Engrossed |
2015-05-26 | House | Cosponsors Added |
2015-05-26 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1097 |
2015-05-26 | House | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 1096 |
2015-05-26 | House | Judiciary Amendment Offered |
2015-05-26 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2015-04-30 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment |
2015-04-07 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Judiciary |