AL HB433 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on February 26 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-02-26 - Forwarded to Executive Department on February 26, 2014
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on February 26 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-02-26 - Forwarded to Executive Department on February 26, 2014
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Morgan Co., Tennessee Valley Authority distributions, allocations revised, Act 2013-328, 2013 Reg. Sess, repealed and superseded
Title
Morgan Co., Tennessee Valley Authority distributions, allocations revised, Act 2013-328, 2013 Reg. Sess, repealed and superseded
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-02-26 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2014-02-13 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 36 Abs: 26) [PASS]
2014-02-13 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 36 Abs: 26) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-26 | House | Forwarded to Executive Department on February 26, 2014 |
2014-02-26 | House | Assigned Act No. 2014-109. |
2014-02-26 | House | Clerk of the House Certification |
2014-02-26 | House | Enrolled |
2014-02-26 | Senate | Signature Requested |
2014-02-25 | House | Passed Second House |
2014-02-25 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 490 |
2014-02-25 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2014-02-20 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2014-02-13 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Local Legislation No. 1 |
2014-02-13 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 254 |
2014-02-13 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2014-02-12 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2014-02-06 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Local Legislation |