AL HB433 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 16 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-16 - Assigned Act No. 2012-568.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 16 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-16 - Assigned Act No. 2012-568.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
General fund budget, appropriations for ordinary expenses of executive, legislative, and judicial departments
Title
General fund budget, appropriations for ordinary expenses of executive, legislative, and judicial departments
Sponsors
Rep. Jim Barton [R] |
Roll Calls
2012-05-20 - Senate - Orr motion to Concur In and Adopt (Y: 29 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-20 - Senate - Marsh motion to Accede (Y: 29 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2012-05-19 - House - Barton motion to Concur In and Adopt (Y: 77 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-19 - House - Collins motion to Previous Question (Y: 64 N: 36 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2012-05-19 - House - Barton motion to Suspend Rules Roll Call 1607 (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2012-05-16 - House - Barton motion to Non Concur and Appoint Conference Committee (Y: 89 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2012-05-12 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 21 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2012-05-12 - Senate - Bedford motion to Adopt (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2012-05-12 - Senate - Bedford motion to Adopt (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2012-05-11 - Senate - Bedford motion to Adopt (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2012-05-11 - Senate - Bedford motion to Adopt (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2012-05-11 - Senate - Orr motion to Table (Y: 15 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2012-05-11 - Senate - Smitherman motion to Adopt (Y: 27 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2012-05-11 - Senate - Orr motion to Adopt (Y: 26 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2012-05-11 - Senate - Orr motion to Adopt (Y: 18 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2012-04-11 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 56 N: 47 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-04-11 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 78 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2012-04-11 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 87 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2012-04-11 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 88 N: 11 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2012-04-11 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 75 N: 14 NV: 1 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2012-05-20 - Senate - Marsh motion to Accede (Y: 29 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2012-05-19 - House - Barton motion to Concur In and Adopt (Y: 77 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-19 - House - Collins motion to Previous Question (Y: 64 N: 36 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2012-05-19 - House - Barton motion to Suspend Rules Roll Call 1607 (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2012-05-16 - House - Barton motion to Non Concur and Appoint Conference Committee (Y: 89 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2012-05-12 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 21 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2012-05-12 - Senate - Bedford motion to Adopt (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2012-05-12 - Senate - Bedford motion to Adopt (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2012-05-11 - Senate - Bedford motion to Adopt (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2012-05-11 - Senate - Bedford motion to Adopt (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2012-05-11 - Senate - Orr motion to Table (Y: 15 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2012-05-11 - Senate - Smitherman motion to Adopt (Y: 27 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2012-05-11 - Senate - Orr motion to Adopt (Y: 26 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2012-05-11 - Senate - Orr motion to Adopt (Y: 18 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2012-04-11 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 56 N: 47 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-04-11 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 78 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2012-04-11 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 87 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2012-04-11 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 88 N: 11 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2012-04-11 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 75 N: 14 NV: 1 Abs: 15) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-16 | Assigned Act No. 2012-568. | |
2012-05-16 | Delivered to Governor at 11:59 p. m. on May 16, 2012. | |
2012-05-16 | Clerk of the House Certification | |
2012-05-16 | Enrolled | |
2012-05-16 | Signature Requested | |
2012-05-16 | Concurred in Conference Report | |
2012-05-16 | Orr motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Roll Call 1594 | |
2012-05-16 | Conference Report Concurrence Requested | |
2012-05-16 | Barton motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Roll Call 1609 | |
2012-05-16 | Collins motion to Previous Question adopted Roll Call 1608 | |
2012-05-16 | Barton motion to Concur In and Adopt offered | |
2012-05-16 | Conference Committee on HB433 2012RS first Substitute Offered | |
2012-05-16 | Barton motion in writing adopted Roll Call 1607 | |
2012-05-16 | Conference Report | |
2012-05-16 | Conference Committee Appointed | |
2012-05-16 | Marsh motion to Accede adopted Roll Call 1412 P&PO appoints Orr, Marsh and Bedford | |
2012-05-16 | Conference Committee Requested | |
2012-05-16 | Barton motion to Non Concur and Appoint Conference Committee adopted Roll Call 1529 House appoints Barton, Love and Hall | |
2012-05-16 | Concurrence Requested | |
2012-05-10 | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1397 | |
2012-05-10 | Bedford motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 1396 | |
2012-05-10 | Bedford Amendment Offered | |
2012-05-10 | Bedford motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 1395 | |
2012-05-10 | Bedford Amendment Offered | |
2012-05-10 | Bedford motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 1394 | |
2012-05-10 | Bedford Amendment Offered | |
2012-05-10 | Orr motion to Table adopted Roll Call 1393 | |
2012-05-10 | Figures Amendment Offered | |
2012-05-10 | Smitherman motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 1392 | |
2012-05-10 | Smitherman Amendment Offered | |
2012-05-10 | Orr motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 1391 | |
2012-05-10 | Orr Amendment Offered | |
2012-05-10 | Orr motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 1390 | |
2012-05-10 | Finance and Taxation General Fund Committee first Substitute Offered | |
2012-05-10 | Further Consideration of HB360 | |
2012-05-09 | Marsh Carry Over to the Call of the Chair Granted | |
2012-05-09 | Finance and Taxation General Fund first Substitute Offered | |
2012-05-09 | Third Reading Carried Over to Call of the Chair | |
2012-05-08 | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar with 1 substitute and | |
2012-04-12 | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Finance and Taxation General Fund | |
2012-04-10 | Engrossed | |
2012-04-10 | Grimsley intended to vote "Abstain" and Mitchell intended to vote "Nay" | |
2012-04-10 | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 678 | |
2012-04-10 | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 677 | |
2012-04-10 | Long 1st Amendment Offered | |
2012-04-10 | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 676 | |
2012-04-10 | Love Amendment Offered | |
2012-04-10 | Third Reading Passed | |
2012-04-10 | Barton motion to Carry Over Temporarily adopted Voice Vote | |
2012-04-10 | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 674 | |
2012-04-10 | Barton Amendment Offered | |
2012-04-10 | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 673 | |
2012-04-10 | Ways and Means General Fund first Substitute Offered | |
2012-04-10 | Third Reading Carried Over | |
2012-04-05 | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar with 1 substitute and | |
2012-02-28 | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Ways and Means General Fund |