AL HB431 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-30 - Delivered to Governor at 1:35 p.m. on May 30, 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-30 - Delivered to Governor at 1:35 p.m. on May 30, 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Dale Co., law enforcement, authorized to take an individual with mental illness into protective custody under certain conditions, protection from civil and criminal liabilities
Title
Dale Co., law enforcement, authorized to take an individual with mental illness into protective custody under certain conditions, protection from civil and criminal liabilities
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-30 - House - Clouse motion to Concur In and Adopt (Y: 68 N: 0 NV: 29 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-05-29 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 22 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2019-05-29 - Senate - Chambliss motion to Adopt (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2019-04-25 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 63 Abs: 18) [FAIL]
2019-05-29 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 22 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2019-05-29 - Senate - Chambliss motion to Adopt (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2019-04-25 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 63 Abs: 18) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-30 | House | Delivered to Governor at 1:35 p.m. on May 30, 2019. |
2019-05-30 | House | Assigned Act No. 2019-534. |
2019-05-30 | House | Clerk of the House Certification |
2019-05-30 | Senate | Signature Requested |
2019-05-30 | House | Enrolled |
2019-05-30 | Senate | Concurred in Second House Amendment |
2019-05-30 | House | Clouse motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Roll Call 1167 |
2019-05-30 | House | Concurrence Requested |
2019-05-29 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1299 |
2019-05-29 | Senate | Chambliss motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 1298 |
2019-05-29 | Senate | Chambliss Amendment Offered |
2019-05-29 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2019-05-28 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Local Legislation |
2019-04-25 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 360 |
2019-04-25 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2019-04-23 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2019-04-16 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Local Legislation |