AL HB43 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 4 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-04-06 - Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Fiscal Responsibility and Economic Development
Pending: Senate Fiscal Responsibility and Economic Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 4 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-04-06 - Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Fiscal Responsibility and Economic Development
Pending: Senate Fiscal Responsibility and Economic Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
St. Clair Co., alcoholic beverages, beer tax, distribution of proceeds of the uniform beer tax, Sec. 28-3-190 am'd.
Title
St. Clair Co., alcoholic beverages, beer tax, distribution of proceeds of the uniform beer tax, Sec. 28-3-190 am'd.
Sponsors
Rep. Jim Hill [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-04-04 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 58 N: 7 NV: 24 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2017-04-04 - House - Hill motion to Table (Y: 76 N: 4 NV: 14 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2017-04-04 - House - Hill motion to Table (Y: 76 N: 4 NV: 14 Abs: 10) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-06 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Fiscal Responsibility and Economic Development |
2017-04-04 | House | Hanes and Bracy intended to vote "Abstain" and Mooney intended to vote "Yea" |
2017-04-04 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 384 |
2017-04-04 | House | Hill motion to Table adopted Roll Call 383 |
2017-04-04 | House | Economic Development and Tourism Amendment Offered |
2017-04-04 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2017-04-04 | House | Mooney intended to vote "Yea" |
2017-03-09 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment |
2017-02-07 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Economic Development and Tourism |