AL HB429 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 22 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-22 - Forwarded to Governor on March 22, 2018 at 2:22 p.m. on March 22, 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 22 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-22 - Forwarded to Governor on March 22, 2018 at 2:22 p.m. on March 22, 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Nurse practitioners and nurse midwives authorized to sign certain forms which may be signed by a physician, procedure to add other forms
Title
Nurse practitioners and nurse midwives authorized to sign certain forms which may be signed by a physician, procedure to add other forms
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-22 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2018-03-01 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-03-01 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-22 | House | Forwarded to Governor on March 22, 2018 at 2:22 p.m. on March 22, 2018. |
2018-03-22 | House | Assigned Act No. 2018-474. |
2018-03-22 | House | Clerk of the House Certification |
2018-03-22 | House | Enrolled |
2018-03-22 | Senate | Signature Requested |
2018-03-22 | House | Passed Second House |
2018-03-22 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1054 |
2018-03-22 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Acted on by Health and Human Services as Favorable |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Health and Human Services |
2018-03-01 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 548 |
2018-03-01 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2018-02-22 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2018-02-15 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Health |