AL HB427 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 21 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-05 - Judiciary first Amendment Offered
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 21 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-05 - Judiciary first Amendment Offered
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Revenue Department, Tax Appeals Commission, established, Administrative Law Division abolished, Tax Appeals Commission Act, Secs. 40-2B-1 to 40-2B-25, inclusive, added; Secs. 40-2A-3, 40-2A-4, 40-2A-5, 40-2A-7, 40-2A-8, 40-2A-10, 40-2A-11, 40-18-27 am'd.; Sec. 40-2A-9 repealed
Title
Revenue Department, Tax Appeals Commission, established, Administrative Law Division abolished, Tax Appeals Commission Act, Secs. 40-2B-1 to 40-2B-25, inclusive, added; Secs. 40-2A-3, 40-2A-4, 40-2A-5, 40-2A-7, 40-2A-8, 40-2A-10, 40-2A-11, 40-18-27 am'd.; Sec. 40-2A-9 repealed
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-04-21 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 88 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-05 | Judiciary first Amendment Offered | |
2011-05-05 | Pending third reading on day 24 Favorable from Judiciary with 1 amendment | |
2011-05-05 | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment | |
2011-04-27 | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Judiciary | |
2011-04-21 | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 437 | |
2011-04-21 | Third Reading Passed | |
2011-04-14 | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar | |
2011-03-31 | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Judiciary |