AL HB426 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 23 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-31 - Further Consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 23 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-31 - Further Consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Uniform Residential Landlord and Tenant Act, landlord duties, smoke alarms required, Sec. 35-9A-204 am'd.
Title
Uniform Residential Landlord and Tenant Act, landlord duties, smoke alarms required, Sec. 35-9A-204 am'd.
Sponsors
Rep. Joe Lovvorn [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-04-23 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 98 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-31 | Senate | Further Consideration |
2019-05-31 | Senate | Livingston motion to Carry Over to the Call of the Chair adopted Voice Vote |
2019-05-31 | Senate | Third Reading Carried Over to Call of the Chair |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Fiscal Responsibility and Economic Development |
2019-04-23 | House | Engrossed |
2019-04-23 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 351 |
2019-04-23 | House | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 350 |
2019-04-23 | House | Wadsworth Amendment Offered |
2019-04-23 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2019-04-18 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2019-04-11 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Public Safety and Homeland Security |