AL HB424 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 27 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-27 - Forwarded to Governor on March 27, 2018 at 6:09 p.m. on March 27, 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 27 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-27 - Forwarded to Governor on March 27, 2018 at 6:09 p.m. on March 27, 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Gadsden, board of education, election at the same time and from the same districts as city council, qualifications, terms, compensation, filling vacancies, referendum
Title
Gadsden, board of education, election at the same time and from the same districts as city council, qualifications, terms, compensation, filling vacancies, referendum
Sponsors
Rep. Mack Butler [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-03-27 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-03-20 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 66 Abs: 31) [FAIL]
2018-03-20 - House - Butler motion to Adopt (Y: 1 N: 4 NV: 50 Abs: 47) [FAIL]
2018-03-20 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 66 Abs: 31) [FAIL]
2018-03-20 - House - Butler motion to Adopt (Y: 1 N: 4 NV: 50 Abs: 47) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-27 | House | Forwarded to Governor on March 27, 2018 at 6:09 p.m. on March 27, 2018. |
2018-03-27 | House | Forwarded to Governor on March 27, 2018 at 6:09 p.m. on March 27, 2018. |
2018-03-27 | House | Assigned Act No. 2018-565. |
2018-03-27 | House | Clerk of the House Certification |
2018-03-27 | House | Enrolled |
2018-03-27 | Senate | Signature Requested |
2018-03-27 | House | Passed Second House |
2018-03-27 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1175 |
2018-03-27 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2018-03-22 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2018-03-21 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Local Legislation |
2018-03-20 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 878 |
2018-03-20 | House | Butler motion to Adopt lost Roll Call 877 |
2018-03-20 | House | Ford Amendment Offered |
2018-03-20 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2018-02-22 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2018-02-15 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Local Legislation |