AL HB423 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 23 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-05-31 - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass lost Roll Call 1484
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Public schools, require a child successfully complete kindergarten before being admitted to the first grade, Sec. 16-28-4 am'd.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Public schools, require a child successfully complete kindergarten before being admitted to the first grade, Sec. 16-28-4 am'd.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-31 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 13 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2019-05-23 - House - Cosponsors Added (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 45) [PASS]
2019-05-23 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 91 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-05-23 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 86 N: 12 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-31SenateMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass lost Roll Call 1484
2019-05-31SenateLost in second house
2019-05-30SenateRead for the second time and placed on the calendar
2019-05-28SenateRead for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Education Policy
2019-05-23HouseEngrossed
2019-05-23HouseCosponsors Added
2019-05-23HouseMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 959
2019-05-23HouseMotion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 958
2019-05-23HouseEducation Policy first Substitute Offered
2019-05-23HouseThird Reading Passed
2019-05-16HouseRead for the second time and placed on the calendar with 1 substitute and
2019-04-11HouseRead for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Education Policy

Subjects


Alabama State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/Alison/SESSBillStatusResult.aspx?BILL=HB423&WIN_TYPE=SELECTED_STATUS
Texthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2019RS/PrintFiles/HB423-int.pdf
Texthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2019RS/PrintFiles/HB423-eng.pdf
Amendmenthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2019RS/PrintFiles/201119-2.pdf
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=623489&VOTE=958&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1074&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=623490&VOTE=959&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1074&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=623491&VOTE=960&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1074&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=628030&VOTE=1484&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1074&AMDSUB= 

Bill Comments

feedback