AL HB422 | 2023 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 1 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-01 - Enacted
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Relating to the waters of the state impounded by Lewis Smith Dam (Lewis Smith Lake), to the waters of the state impounded by R.L. Harris Dam (Lake Wedowee), and on Shoals Creek in Lauderdale County north of Highway 72; to regulate and prohibit wakeboarding and wakesurfing under certain conditions; to provide penalties for violations; and in connection therewith would have as its purpose or effect the requirement of a new or increased expenditure of local funds within the meaning of Section 111.05 of the Constitution of Alabama of 2022.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the waters of the state impounded by Lewis Smith Dam (Lewis Smith Lake), to the waters of the state impounded by R.L. Harris Dam (Lake Wedowee), and on Shoals Creek in Lauderdale County north of Highway 72; to regulate and prohibit wakeboarding and wakesurfing under certain conditions; to provide penalties for violations; and in connection therewith would have as its purpose or effect the requirement of a new or increased expenditure of local funds within the meaning of Section 111.05 of the Constitution of Alabama of 2022.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-06-01 - Senate - Read A Third Time And Passed As Amended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-06-01 - Senate - Adopt YEKY62-1 (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-06-01 - House - Concur In and Adopt (Y: 97 N: 2 NV: 3 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-05-18 - House - Read a Third Time and Pass as Amended (Y: 69 N: 7 NV: 28 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-05-18 - House - Adopt CE75QQ-1 (Y: 80 N: 0 NV: 23 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-06-01HouseEnacted
2023-06-01HouseEnrolled
2023-06-01HouseConcur In and Adopt
2023-06-01SenateRead A Third Time And Passed As Amended
2023-06-01SenateAdopt YEKY62-1
2023-06-01SenateOn Third Reading in Second House
2023-05-24SenateRead Second Time in Second House
2023-05-24SenateReported Out of Committee in Second House
2023-05-24SenateReported Favorably
2023-05-24SenateReported Favorably from Senate Fiscal Responsibility and Economic Development
2023-05-18SenateReferred to Committee to Senate Fiscal Responsibility and Economic Development
2023-05-18HouseRead First Time in Second House
2023-05-18HouseRead a Third Time and Pass as Amended
2023-05-18HouseAdopt CE75QQ-1
2023-05-18HouseOn Third Reading in House of Origin
2023-05-11HouseRead Second Time in House of Origin
2023-05-10HouseReported Out of Committee in House of Origin
2023-05-10HouseReported Favorably from House Public Safety and Homeland Security
2023-05-02HouseIntroduced and Referred to House Public Safety and Homeland Security
2023-05-02HouseRead First Time in House of Origin

Subjects


Alabama State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://alison.legislature.state.al.us/bill-search
Texthttps://alison.legislature.state.al.us/files/pdf/SearchableInstruments/2023RS/HB422-int.pdf
Texthttps://alison.legislature.state.al.us/files/pdf/SearchableInstruments/2023RS/HB422-eng.pdf
Texthttps://alison.legislature.state.al.us/files/pdf/SearchableInstruments/2023RS/HB422-enr.pdf
Amendmenthttps://alison.legislature.state.al.us/files/pdf/SearchableInstruments/2023RS/CE75QQ-1.pdf
Amendmenthttps://alison.legislature.state.al.us/files/pdf/SearchableInstruments/2023RS/YEKY62-1.pdf
Supplementhttps://alison.legislature.state.al.us/files/pdf/SearchableInstruments/2023RS/FiscalNotes/FN-2G3GSS-1.pdf
Supplementhttps://alison.legislature.state.al.us/files/pdf/SearchableInstruments/2023RS/FiscalNotes/FN-2G3GSS-2.pdf
Roll Callhttps://alison.legislature.state.al.us/bill-search#rc777
Roll Callhttps://alison.legislature.state.al.us/bill-search#rc778
Roll Callhttps://alison.legislature.state.al.us/bill-search#rc1132
Roll Callhttps://alison.legislature.state.al.us/bill-search#rc1210
Roll Callhttps://alison.legislature.state.al.us/bill-search#rc1211

Bill Comments

feedback