AL HB422 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 11 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-31 - Economic Development and Tourism first Amendment Offered
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 11 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-31 - Economic Development and Tourism first Amendment Offered
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Macon Co., bingo, may be played on electronic machines authorized by the National Indian Gaming Commission, const. amend.
Title
Macon Co., bingo, may be played on electronic machines authorized by the National Indian Gaming Commission, const. amend.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-31 | House | Economic Development and Tourism first Amendment Offered |
2019-05-31 | House | Third Reading Received |
2019-05-02 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment |
2019-04-18 | House | Rereferred from Local Legislation to ED&T |
2019-04-11 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Local Legislation |