AL HB421 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 17 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-05-03 - Pending third reading on day 26 Favorable from Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 17 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-05-03 - Pending third reading on day 26 Favorable from Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Bestiality and possession of obscene matter depicting bestiality, crime established, penalties
Title
Bestiality and possession of obscene matter depicting bestiality, crime established, penalties
Sponsors
Rep. Craig Ford [D] |
Roll Calls
2012-04-18 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-03 | Pending third reading on day 26 Favorable from Judiciary | |
2012-05-03 | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar | |
2012-04-17 | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Judiciary | |
2012-04-17 | Boman intended top vote "Yea" | |
2012-04-17 | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 808 | |
2012-04-17 | Third Reading Passed | |
2012-03-22 | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar | |
2012-02-23 | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Judiciary |