AL HB420 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 17 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-17 - Delivered to Governor at 8:39 p.m. on May 17, 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 17 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-17 - Delivered to Governor at 8:39 p.m. on May 17, 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Motor vehicles, sales and loan transactions, guaranteed asset protection waivers authorized, coverage of loan balance if vehicle a total loss or stolen, Superintendent of Banks authorized to assess penalties, Secs. 8-37-1 to 8-37-9, inclusive, added
Title
Motor vehicles, sales and loan transactions, guaranteed asset protection waivers authorized, coverage of loan balance if vehicle a total loss or stolen, Superintendent of Banks authorized to assess penalties, Secs. 8-37-1 to 8-37-9, inclusive, added
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-17 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-17 | House | Delivered to Governor at 8:39 p.m. on May 17, 2017. |
2017-05-17 | House | Assigned Act No. 2017-392. |
2017-05-17 | House | Clerk of the House Certification |
2017-05-17 | Senate | Signature Requested |
2017-05-17 | House | Enrolled |
2017-05-17 | House | Passed Second House |
2017-05-17 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1206 |
2017-05-17 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2017-05-03 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2017-04-27 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Banking and Insurance |
2017-04-25 | House | Engrossed |
2017-04-25 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 615 |
2017-04-25 | House | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 614 |
2017-04-25 | House | Financial Services Amendment Offered |
2017-04-25 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2017-04-06 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment |
2017-03-16 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Financial Services |