AL HB420 | 2014 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 13 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-03 - Further Consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Conservation and Natural Resources Department, regulation of public exhibition of wildlife, additional fee authorized, exemptions revised, Secs. 9-11-324, 9-11-328 am'd.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Conservation and Natural Resources Department, regulation of public exhibition of wildlife, additional fee authorized, exemptions revised, Secs. 9-11-324, 9-11-328 am'd.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2014-03-13 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 85 N: 4 NV: 3 Abs: 12) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2014-04-03SenateFurther Consideration
2014-04-03SenateHolley motion to Carry Over adopted Voice Vote
2014-04-03SenateAgriculture, Conservation, and Forestry Amendment Offered
2014-04-03SenateThird Reading Carried Over
2014-03-19SenateRead for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment
2014-03-13SenateRead for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Agriculture, Conservation, and Forestry
2014-03-13HouseMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 795
2014-03-13HouseThird Reading Passed
2014-02-12HouseRead for the second time and placed on the calendar
2014-02-06HouseRead for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Agriculture and Forestry

Subjects


Alabama State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback