AL HB42 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 25 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-05 - Pending third reading on day 11 Favorable from Children, Youth and Human Services
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 25 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-05 - Pending third reading on day 11 Favorable from Children, Youth and Human Services
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Missing and endangered persons, to expand existing law to include missing and endangered persons suffering from a mental or physical disability who are at risk of bodily harm or death; Secs. 26-19A-1 to 26-19A-5, inclusive, am'd.
Title
Missing and endangered persons, to expand existing law to include missing and endangered persons suffering from a mental or physical disability who are at risk of bodily harm or death; Secs. 26-19A-1 to 26-19A-5, inclusive, am'd.
Sponsors
Rep. Laura Hall [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-02-25 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-05 | Senate | Pending third reading on day 11 Favorable from Children, Youth and Human Services |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Children, Youth and Human Services |
2020-02-25 | House | Engrossed |
2020-02-25 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 139 |
2020-02-25 | House | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 138 |
2020-02-25 | House | Children and Senior Advocacy Amendment Offered |
2020-02-25 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2020-02-20 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment |
2020-02-04 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Children and Senior Advocacy |