AL HB417 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 27 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-27 - Forwarded to Governor on March 27, 2018 at 6:09 p.m. on March 27, 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 27 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-27 - Forwarded to Governor on March 27, 2018 at 6:09 p.m. on March 27, 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Banks, state regulated, service providers, Superintendent of Banks authorized to examine, Examination of Bank Service Providers Act, Secs. 5-3A-30 to 5-3A-35, inclusive, added
Title
Banks, state regulated, service providers, Superintendent of Banks authorized to examine, Examination of Bank Service Providers Act, Secs. 5-3A-30 to 5-3A-35, inclusive, added
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-27 - Senate - Coleman-Madison motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 24 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-03-15 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 88 N: 7 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2018-03-15 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 90 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2018-03-15 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 88 N: 7 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2018-03-15 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 90 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-27 | House | Forwarded to Governor on March 27, 2018 at 6:09 p.m. on March 27, 2018. |
2018-03-27 | House | Forwarded to Governor on March 27, 2018 at 6:09 p.m. on March 27, 2018. |
2018-03-27 | House | Assigned Act No. 2018-500. |
2018-03-27 | House | Clerk of the House Certification |
2018-03-27 | House | Enrolled |
2018-03-27 | Senate | Signature Requested |
2018-03-27 | House | Passed Second House |
2018-03-27 | Senate | Coleman-Madison motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1184 |
2018-03-27 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2018-03-20 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Governmental Affairs |
2018-03-15 | House | Engrossed |
2018-03-15 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 807 |
2018-03-15 | House | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 806 |
2018-03-15 | House | Financial Services first Substitute Offered |
2018-03-15 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2018-03-08 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar with 1 substitute and |
2018-02-15 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Financial Services |