AL HB416 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 25 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-05-02 - Pending third reading on day 28 Favorable from Veterans and Military Affairs
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 25 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-05-02 - Pending third reading on day 28 Favorable from Veterans and Military Affairs
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Deferred presentment services, military, protect from abusive lending practices, Sec. 5-18A-15 am'd.
Title
Deferred presentment services, military, protect from abusive lending practices, Sec. 5-18A-15 am'd.
Sponsors
Rep. Harry Bridges [R] | Rep. Barry Moore [R] | Rep. Paul Lee [R] |
Roll Calls
2013-04-25 - House - Cosponsors Added (Y: 89 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2013-04-25 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2013-04-25 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-02 | Senate | Pending third reading on day 28 Favorable from Veterans and Military Affairs |
2013-05-02 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2013-04-30 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Veterans and Military Affairs |
2013-04-25 | House | Cosponsors Added |
2013-04-25 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 902 |
2013-04-25 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2013-03-20 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2013-03-07 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Military and Veterans Affairs |