AL HB414 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 25 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-25 - Enacted
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 25 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-25 - Enacted
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Relating to Tallapoosa County; authorizing the levy of a lodging tax in the unincorporated area of the county; and providing for the distribution of the proceeds from the tax.
Title
Relating to Tallapoosa County; authorizing the levy of a lodging tax in the unincorporated area of the county; and providing for the distribution of the proceeds from the tax.
Sponsors
Rep. Ed Oliver [R] |
Roll Calls
2023-05-25 - Senate - Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-05-09 - House - Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 94 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2023-05-09 - House - Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 94 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-25 | House | Enacted |
2023-05-25 | House | Enrolled |
2023-05-25 | Senate | Ready to Enroll |
2023-05-25 | Senate | Read a Third Time and Pass |
2023-05-25 | Senate | On Third Reading in Second House |
2023-05-24 | Senate | Read Second Time in Second House |
2023-05-24 | Senate | Reported Out of Committee in Second House |
2023-05-24 | Senate | Reported Favorably from Senate Local Legislation |
2023-05-11 | Senate | Referred to Committee to Senate Local Legislation |
2023-05-11 | House | Read First Time in Second House |
2023-05-09 | House | Read a Third Time and Pass |
2023-05-09 | House | On Third Reading in House of Origin |
2023-05-04 | House | Read Second Time in House of Origin |
2023-05-04 | House | Reported Out of Committee in House of Origin |
2023-05-04 | House | Reported Favorably from House Local Legislation |
2023-05-02 | House | Introduced and Referred to House Local Legislation |
2023-05-02 | House | Read First Time in House of Origin |