AL HB414 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 21 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-21 - Delivered to Governor at 10:13 a.m. on March 21, 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 21 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-21 - Delivered to Governor at 10:13 a.m. on March 21, 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Alcoholic beverages, nonprofit special events retail license, provided for, donation of beer, wine, and liquor authorized, Sec. 28-3A-6 am'd.
Title
Alcoholic beverages, nonprofit special events retail license, provided for, donation of beer, wine, and liquor authorized, Sec. 28-3A-6 am'd.
Sponsors
Rep. Craig Ford [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-03-20 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2018-03-08 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 80 N: 3 NV: 11 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-03-08 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 80 N: 3 NV: 11 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-21 | House | Delivered to Governor at 10:13 a.m. on March 21, 2018. |
2018-03-21 | House | Assigned Act No. 2018-447. |
2018-03-21 | House | Clerk of the House Certification |
2018-03-21 | Senate | Signature Requested |
2018-03-20 | House | Enrolled |
2018-03-20 | House | Passed Second House |
2018-03-20 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 895 |
2018-03-20 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Fiscal Responsibility and Economic Development |
2018-03-08 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 657 |
2018-03-08 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2018-02-22 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2018-02-13 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Economic Development and Tourism |