AL HB414 | 2011 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 9 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-09 - Delivered to Governor at 2:30 p.m. on June 9, 2011.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Retirement, judges, education employees, including teachers, state employees, firefighter, law enforcement officer, correctional officer, retirement contributions increased, Pension Accumulation Fund, Secs. 12-18-5, 12-18-52, 12-18-82, 16-25-21, 36-27-24, 36-27-59 am'd.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Retirement, judges, education employees, including teachers, state employees, firefighter, law enforcement officer, correctional officer, retirement contributions increased, Pension Accumulation Fund, Secs. 12-18-5, 12-18-52, 12-18-82, 16-25-21, 36-27-24, 36-27-59 am'd.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2011-06-09 - Senate - Marsh motion to Concur In and Adopt (Y: 19 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2011-06-09 - Senate - Rules Petition to cease debate (Y: 22 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-06-02 - House - Love motion to Concur In and Adopt (Y: 51 N: 48 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2011-06-02 - Senate - Marsh motion to Accede (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2011-06-02 - House - Love motion to Non Concur and Appoint Conference Committee (Y: 71 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 34) [PASS]
2011-06-01 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 19 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-06-01 - Senate - Pittman Substitute (Y: 20 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-06-01 - Senate - Rules Committee Petition to Cease Debate (Y: 22 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-06-01 - Senate - Marsh tabled Marsh Amendment to Pittman Substitute Roll Call 866. (Y: 16 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2011-06-01 - Senate - Bedford Amendment (Y: 13 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2011-06-01 - Senate - Rules Committee Petition to Cease Debate (Y: 22 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-06-01 - Senate - Marsh motion to Table (Y: 19 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2011-04-12 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 54 N: 41 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2011-04-12 - House - Motion to Adopt WME substitute (Y: 56 N: 37 NV: 2 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2011-04-12 - House - Ball motion to Previous Question (Y: 56 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 18) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2011-06-09 Delivered to Governor at 2:30 p.m. on June 9, 2011.
2011-06-09 Conference Committee on HB414 2011RS first Substitute Offered
2011-06-09 Assigned Act No. 2011-676.
2011-06-09 Clerk of the House Certification
2011-06-09 Enrolled
2011-06-09 Signature Requested
2011-06-09 Concurred in Conference Report
2011-06-09 Marsh motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Roll Call 1048
2011-06-09 Rules Petition to cease debate adopted Roll Call 1047.
2011-06-09 Conference Report Concurrence Requested
2011-06-02 Nordgren intended to vote "Yea"
2011-06-02 Love motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Roll Call 1142
2011-06-02 Conference Report
2011-06-02 Conference Committee Appointed
2011-06-02 Marsh motion to Accede adopted Roll Call 1027 P&PO appoints Pittman, Waggoner and Sanders
2011-06-02 Conference Committee Requested
2011-06-02 Love motion to Non Concur and Appoint Conference Committee adopted Roll Call 1067 House appoints Love, McMillan and Rogers
2011-06-02 Concurrence Requested
2011-06-01 Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 869
2011-06-01 Pittman Substitute adopted Roll Call 868.
2011-06-01 Rules Committee Petition to Cease Debate adopted Roll Call 867.
2011-06-01 Marsh tabled Marsh Amendment to Pittman Substitute Roll Call 866.
2011-06-01 Marsh Amendment to Pittman Substitute Offered
2011-06-01 Bedford Amendment lost Roll Call 865.
2011-06-01 Rules Committee Petition to Cease Debate adopted Roll Call 864.
2011-06-01 Bedford Amendment to Pittman Substitute Offered.
2011-06-01 Pittman first Substitute Offered
2011-06-01 Marsh motion to Table adopted Roll Call 863
2011-06-01 Finance and Taxation Education first Substitute Offered
2011-06-01 Third Reading Passed
2011-05-03 Marsh motion to Carry Over adopted Voice Vote
2011-05-03 Third Reading Carried Over
2011-04-26 Givan intended to vote "Nay"
2011-04-21 Read for the second time and placed on the calendar with 1 substitute and
2011-04-14 Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Finance and Taxation Education
2011-04-12 Engrossed
2011-04-12 Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 232
2011-04-12 Motion to Adopt WME substitute adopted Roll Call 231
2011-04-12 Ball motion to Previous Question adopted Roll Call 230
2011-04-12 Third Reading Passed
2011-04-12 Buskey motion to Carry Over Temporarily adopted Voice Vote
2011-04-12 Ways and Means Education first Substitute reported
2011-04-12 Third Reading Carried Over
2011-04-06 Read for the second time and placed on the calendar with 1 substitute and
2011-03-31 Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Ways and Means Education

Subjects



Alabama State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/SESSBillResult.ASPX?WIN_TYPE=BillResult&BILL=HB414
Texthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2011RS/PrintFiles/HB414-int.pdf
Texthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2011RS/PrintFiles/HB414-eng.pdf
Texthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2011RS/PrintFiles/HB414-enr.pdf
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=403756&VOTE=230&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1058&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=403757&VOTE=231&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1058&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=403758&VOTE=232&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1058&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=418339&VOTE=863&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1058&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=418342&VOTE=864&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1058&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=418385&VOTE=865&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1058&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=418394&VOTE=866&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1058&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=418398&VOTE=867&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1058&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=418400&VOTE=868&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1058&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=418408&VOTE=869&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1058&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=419066&VOTE=1067&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1058&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=420167&VOTE=1027&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1058&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=420517&VOTE=1142&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1058&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=421679&VOTE=1047&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1058&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=421644&VOTE=1048&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1058&AMDSUB= 

Bill Comments

feedback