AL HB413 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 7 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-07 - Passed Second House
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 7 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-07 - Passed Second House
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Dental Scholarship and Loan Awards Board, named, membership and meetings, eliminates Rural Dental Scholars Program, board authorized to make loans for furthering dental education, Secs. 16-47-76, 16-47-77, 16-47-78, 16-47-79, 16-47-80, 16-47-81 am'd.
Title
Dental Scholarship and Loan Awards Board, named, membership and meetings, eliminates Rural Dental Scholars Program, board authorized to make loans for furthering dental education, Secs. 16-47-76, 16-47-77, 16-47-78, 16-47-79, 16-47-80, 16-47-81 am'd.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-30 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 788 (Y: 99 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-03-30 - House - Motion to Adopt Roll Call 787 (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-03-30 - House - HBIR: Scott motion to Adopt Roll Call 786 (Y: 94 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2022-03-30 - House - Motion to Adopt Roll Call 787 (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-03-30 - House - HBIR: Scott motion to Adopt Roll Call 786 (Y: 94 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-07 | House | Passed Second House |
2022-04-07 | House | Forwarded to Governor at 11:37 p.m. on April 7, 2022. |
2022-04-07 | House | Assigned Act No. 2022-389. |
2022-04-07 | House | Clerk of the House Certification |
2022-04-07 | Senate | Signature Requested |
2022-04-07 | House | Enrolled |
2022-04-07 | House | Passed Second House |
2022-04-07 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1095 |
2022-04-06 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2022-03-31 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Fiscal Responsibility and Economic Development |
2022-03-30 | House | Engrossed |
2022-03-30 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 788 |
2022-03-30 | House | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 787 |
2022-03-30 | House | Scott Amendment Offered |
2022-03-30 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2022-03-02 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2022-02-24 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Health |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
16 | 47 | 76 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
16 | 47 | 77 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
16 | 47 | 78 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
16 | 47 | 79 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
16 | 47 | 80 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
16 | 47 | 81 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |