AL HB411 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 4 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-04 - Delivered to Governor at 3:10 p.m. on May 4, 2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 4 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-04 - Delivered to Governor at 3:10 p.m. on May 4, 2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Organ donation, Alabama Law Enforcement Agency (ALEA) required to provide information regarding designation on driver's licenses
Title
Organ donation, Alabama Law Enforcement Agency (ALEA) required to provide information regarding designation on driver's licenses
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-05-04 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 24 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2016-04-07 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 100 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-04-07 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 100 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-04 | House | Delivered to Governor at 3:10 p.m. on May 4, 2016. |
2016-05-04 | House | Assigned Act No. 2016-281. |
2016-05-04 | House | Clerk of the House Certification |
2016-05-04 | House | Passed Second House |
2016-05-04 | Senate | Signature Requested |
2016-05-04 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 971 |
2016-05-04 | House | Enrolled |
2016-05-04 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2016-04-20 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2016-04-13 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Health and Human Services |
2016-04-07 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 527 |
2016-04-07 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2016-03-23 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2016-03-15 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Public Safety and Homeland Security |