AL HB409 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 22 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-23 - Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Local Legislation
Pending: Senate Local Legislation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 22 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-23 - Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Local Legislation
Pending: Senate Local Legislation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Colbert Co., Civil Service System, board members, compensation increased, Sec. 45-17A-50.04 am'd.
Title
Colbert Co., Civil Service System, board members, compensation increased, Sec. 45-17A-50.04 am'd.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-03-22 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 72 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-23 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Local Legislation |
2016-03-22 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 362 |
2016-03-22 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2016-03-17 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2016-03-15 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Local Legislation |