AL HB409 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 26 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-02-26 - Assigned Act No. 2014-85.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 26 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-02-26 - Assigned Act No. 2014-85.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Franklin Co., county commission, sales tax authorized for schools, use of a portion for roads for two years, extension by referendum, const. amend.
Title
Franklin Co., county commission, sales tax authorized for schools, use of a portion for roads for two years, extension by referendum, const. amend.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-02-25 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2014-02-11 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 22 Abs: 19) [PASS]
2014-02-11 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 22 Abs: 19) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-26 | House | Assigned Act No. 2014-85. |
2014-02-26 | House | Forwarded to Secretary of State on February 26, 2014 at 3:23 p.m. on February 26, 2014. |
2014-02-26 | House | Clerk of the House Certification |
2014-02-26 | House | Enrolled |
2014-02-26 | Senate | Signature Requested |
2014-02-25 | House | Passed Second House |
2014-02-25 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 494 |
2014-02-25 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2014-02-20 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2014-02-11 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Local Legislation No. 1 |
2014-02-11 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 184 |
2014-02-11 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2014-02-06 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2014-02-04 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Local Legislation |