AL HB409 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 15-2)
Status: Passed on May 16 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-16 - Delivered to Governor at 11:42 p. m. on May 16, 2012.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 15-2)
Status: Passed on May 16 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-16 - Delivered to Governor at 11:42 p. m. on May 16, 2012.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Military museum, Baldwin County designated as site for museum, Military Department authorized to cooperate with (2012-20417)
Title
Military museum, Baldwin County designated as site for museum, Military Department authorized to cooperate with (2012-20417)
Sponsors
Rep. Alan Baker [R] | Rep. Jim Barton [R] | Rep. K.L. Brown [R] | Rep. James Buskey [D] |
Rep. Randy Davis [R] | Rep. Dickie Drake [R] | Rep. Joe Faust [R] | Rep. Chad Fincher [R] |
Rep. Victor Gaston [R] | Rep. Micky Hammon [R] | Rep. James Ison [R] | Rep. Barry Mask [R] |
Rep. Steve McMillan [R] | Rep. Johnny Morrow [D] | Sen. David Sessions [R] | Rep. Harry Shiver [R] |
Rep. Jack Williams [R] |
Roll Calls
2012-05-19 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2012-04-06 - House - Cosponsors Added (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 45) [PASS]
2012-04-06 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2012-04-06 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2012-04-06 - House - Cosponsors Added (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 45) [PASS]
2012-04-06 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2012-04-06 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-16 | Delivered to Governor at 11:42 p. m. on May 16, 2012. | |
2012-05-16 | Assigned Act No. 2012-521. | |
2012-05-16 | Clerk of the House Certification | |
2012-05-16 | Signature Requested | |
2012-05-16 | Enrolled | |
2012-05-16 | Passed Second House | |
2012-05-16 | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1522 | |
2012-05-16 | Third Reading Passed | |
2012-04-19 | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar | |
2012-04-10 | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Veterans and Military Affairs | |
2012-04-05 | Engrossed | |
2012-04-05 | Cosponsors Added | |
2012-04-05 | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 606 | |
2012-04-05 | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 605 | |
2012-04-05 | Military and Veterans Affairs first Substitute Offered | |
2012-04-05 | Third Reading Passed | |
2012-03-08 | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar with 1 substitute and | |
2012-02-23 | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Military and Veterans Affairs |