AL HB405 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 22 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-22 - Delivered to Governor at 3:20 p.m. on April 22, 2010.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 22 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-22 - Delivered to Governor at 3:20 p.m. on April 22, 2010.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Timber and forest products, altering a weight measuring device prohibited, penalties, unauthorized cutting, removal, transportation, sale, or purchase of timber and other forest products designated Class A misdemeanor, exception for electric utility workers, Sec. 9-13-60 am'd.
Title
Timber and forest products, altering a weight measuring device prohibited, penalties, unauthorized cutting, removal, transportation, sale, or purchase of timber and other forest products designated Class A misdemeanor, exception for electric utility workers, Sec. 9-13-60 am'd.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-04-22 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2010-03-11 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2010-03-11 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2010-03-11 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2010-03-11 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-22 | Delivered to Governor at 3:20 p.m. on April 22, 2010. | |
2010-04-22 | Assigned Act No. 2010-704 on 04/29/2010. | |
2010-04-22 | Clerk of the House Certification | |
2010-04-22 | Signature Requested | |
2010-04-22 | Enrolled | |
2010-04-22 | Passed Second House | |
2010-04-22 | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1204 | |
2010-04-22 | Third Reading Passed | |
2010-03-23 | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar | |
2010-03-11 | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Energy and Natural Resources | |
2010-03-11 | Engrossed | |
2010-03-11 | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 577 | |
2010-03-11 | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 576 | |
2010-03-11 | Agriculture and Forestry first Substitute Offered | |
2010-03-11 | Third Reading Passed | |
2010-02-04 | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar with 1 substitute and | |
2010-01-21 | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Agriculture and Forestry |