AL HB404 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 2 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-25 - Pending Senate County and Municipal Government
Pending: Senate County and Municipal Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 2 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-25 - Pending Senate County and Municipal Government
Pending: Senate County and Municipal Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Electronic Security Board of Licensure, requirements for licensing, procedures for operating provided
Title
Electronic Security Board of Licensure, requirements for licensing, procedures for operating provided
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-23 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass - Roll Call 752 (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-04-23 - House - Third Reading in House of Origin (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-04-23 - House - Third Reading in House of Origin (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-25 | Senate | Pending Senate County and Municipal Government |
2024-04-25 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate Committee on County and Municipal Government |
2024-04-23 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass - Adopted Roll Call 752 |
2024-04-23 | House | Third Reading in House of Origin |
2024-04-11 | House | Read for the Second Time and placed on the Calendar |
2024-04-10 | House | Reported Out of Committee House of Origin |
2024-04-02 | House | Pending House Boards, Agencies and Commissions |
2024-04-02 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House Committee on Boards, Agencies and Commissions |