AL HB404 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on April 15 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-15 - Forwarded to Governor on April 15, 2021 at 1:43 p.m. on April 15, 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on April 15 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-15 - Forwarded to Governor on April 15, 2021 at 1:43 p.m. on April 15, 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Student athletes, may earn compensation for use of name, image, or likeness, conditions established, certain postsecondary educational institutions may not restrict, Alabama Collegiate Athletic Commission established to enforce, Sec. 8-26B-32 added.
Title
Student athletes, may earn compensation for use of name, image, or likeness, conditions established, certain postsecondary educational institutions may not restrict, Alabama Collegiate Athletic Commission established to enforce, Sec. 8-26B-32 added.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-15 - House - South motion to Concur In and Adopt Roll Call 846 (Y: 85 N: 2 NV: 7 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2021-04-13 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 941 (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2021-04-13 - Senate - Hatcher motion to Adopt Roll Call 940 (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2021-04-13 - Senate - SBIR: Allen motion to Adopt Roll Call 939 (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2021-03-09 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 326 (Y: 63 N: 31 NV: 5 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-03-09 - House - Motion to Adopt Roll Call 325 (Y: 61 N: 34 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-03-09 - House - Motion to Adopt Roll Call 324 (Y: 64 N: 24 NV: 9 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-03-09 - House - Motion to Adopt Roll Call 323 (Y: 82 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-03-09 - House - HBIR: South motion to Adopt Roll Call 322 (Y: 87 N: 13 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-04-13 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 941 (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2021-04-13 - Senate - Hatcher motion to Adopt Roll Call 940 (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2021-04-13 - Senate - SBIR: Allen motion to Adopt Roll Call 939 (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2021-03-09 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 326 (Y: 63 N: 31 NV: 5 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-03-09 - House - Motion to Adopt Roll Call 325 (Y: 61 N: 34 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-03-09 - House - Motion to Adopt Roll Call 324 (Y: 64 N: 24 NV: 9 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-03-09 - House - Motion to Adopt Roll Call 323 (Y: 82 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-03-09 - House - HBIR: South motion to Adopt Roll Call 322 (Y: 87 N: 13 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-15 | House | Forwarded to Governor on April 15, 2021 at 1:43 p.m. on April 15, 2021. |
2021-04-15 | House | State Government first Amendment Offered |
2021-04-15 | House | Assigned Act No. 2021-227. |
2021-04-15 | House | Clerk of the House Certification |
2021-04-15 | House | Enrolled |
2021-04-15 | Senate | Signature Requested |
2021-04-15 | Senate | Concurred in Second House Amendment |
2021-04-15 | House | Wilcox intended to vote "Yea" |
2021-04-15 | House | South motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Roll Call 846 |
2021-04-15 | House | Concurrence Requested |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 941 |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Hatcher motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 940 |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Hatcher Amendment Offered |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Re-referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Governmental Affairs |
2021-03-09 | House | Engrossed |
2021-03-09 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 326 |
2021-03-09 | House | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 325 |
2021-03-09 | House | Gray Amendment Offered |
2021-03-09 | House | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 324 |
2021-03-09 | House | State Government Amendment Offered |
2021-03-09 | House | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 323 |
2021-03-09 | House | State Government first Substitute Offered |
2021-03-09 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2021-02-24 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar with 1 substitute and 1 amendment |
2021-02-11 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on State Government |
Same As/Similar To
SB230 (Same As) 2021-02-11 - Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Judiciary