AL HB404 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 21 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-05-31 - Further Consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Motor vehicles, distracted driving, use of cell phone while operating a motor vehicle prohibited, exceptions, Secs. 32-5A-353 to 32-5A-358, inclusive, added; Sec. 32-5A-350 repealed; Sec. 32-10-8 am'd.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Motor vehicles, distracted driving, use of cell phone while operating a motor vehicle prohibited, exceptions, Secs. 32-5A-353 to 32-5A-358, inclusive, added; Sec. 32-5A-350 repealed; Sec. 32-10-8 am'd.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-31 - Senate - Albritton motion to Adopt (Y: 8 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
2019-05-31 - Senate - Gudger motion to Adopt (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2019-05-28 - Senate - Ward motion to Adopt (Y: 29 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - House - \\Motion to Adopt (Y: 82 N: 7 NV: 6 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 77 N: 9 NV: 9 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - House - Brown (K) motion to Table (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 23 Abs: 8) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-31SenateFurther Consideration
2019-05-31SenateAlbritton motion to Carry Over to the Call of the Chair adopted Voice Vote
2019-05-31SenateAlbritton motion to Adopt lost Roll Call 1467
2019-05-31SenateGudger motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 1466
2019-05-31SenateAlbritton Amendment Offered
2019-05-31SenateGudger Amendment Offered
2019-05-31SenateThird Reading Carried Over to Call of the Chair
2019-05-28SenateWard motion to Carry Over to the Call of the Chair adopted Voice Vote
2019-05-28SenateWard motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 1189
2019-05-28SenateJudiciary Amendment Offered
2019-05-28SenateThird Reading Carried Over to Call of the Chair
2019-05-22SenateRead for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment
2019-05-21SenateRead for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Judiciary
2019-05-21HouseEngrossed
2019-05-21HouseGarrett intended to vote "Nay" and Marques and Nordgren intended to vote "yea"
2019-05-21HouseMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 815
2019-05-21HouseMotion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 814
2019-05-21HouseBrown (K) Substitute Offered
2019-05-21HouseThird Reading Passed
2019-05-16HouseBrown (K) first Substitute Offered
2019-05-16HouseBrown (K) motion to Table adopted Roll Call 808
2019-05-16HousePublic Safety and Homeland Security Amendment Offered
2019-05-16HouseThird Reading Carried Over
2019-05-07HouseBrown (K) motion to Carry Over Temporarily adopted Voice Vote
2019-05-07HousePublic Safety and Homeland Security Amendment Offered
2019-05-07HouseThird Reading Carried Over
2019-04-18HouseRead for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment
2019-04-11HouseRead for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Public Safety and Homeland Security

Subjects


Alabama State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/Alison/SESSBillStatusResult.aspx?BILL=HB404&WIN_TYPE=SELECTED_STATUS
Texthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2019RS/PrintFiles/HB404-int.pdf
Amendmenthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2019RS/PrintFiles/199432-1.pdf
Amendmenthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2019RS/PrintFiles/201048-3.pdf
Amendmenthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2019RS/PrintFiles/201768-2.pdf
Amendmenthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2019RS/PrintFiles/202378-1.pdf
Amendmenthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2019RS/PrintFiles/202303-1.pdf
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=620514&VOTE=808&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1074&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=620856&VOTE=815&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1074&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=624418&VOTE=1189&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1074&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=627803&VOTE=1466&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1074&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=627804&VOTE=1467&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1074&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=620855&VOTE=814&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1074&AMDSUB= 

Bill Comments

feedback