AL HB404 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 20 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-20 - Assigned Act No. 2013-268.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 20 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-20 - Assigned Act No. 2013-268.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Franklin Co., schools, creation of volunteer security forces, role of sheriff and co. board of education
Title
Franklin Co., schools, creation of volunteer security forces, role of sheriff and co. board of education
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-05-22 - Senate - Fielding motion to Read a Third Time, Veto to the Contrary Not Withstanding (Y: 22 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2013-05-22 - Senate - Marsh motion to Read a Third Time, Veto to the Contrary Not Withstanding (Y: 16 N: 2 NV: 6 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2013-05-22 - House - Morrow motion to Read a Third Time, Veto to the Contrary Not Withstanding (Y: 68 N: 3 NV: 17 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2013-05-22 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2013-05-03 - Senate - Bussman motion to table Smitherman motion to rerefer (Y: 19 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2013-04-16 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 43 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2013-04-16 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 42 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2013-04-16 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 45 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2013-04-16 - House - Morrow motion to Table (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 38 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2013-04-16 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 42 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2013-04-16 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 45 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2013-04-16 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 38 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2013-04-16 - House - Morrow motion to Table (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 42 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2013-05-22 - Senate - Marsh motion to Read a Third Time, Veto to the Contrary Not Withstanding (Y: 16 N: 2 NV: 6 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2013-05-22 - House - Morrow motion to Read a Third Time, Veto to the Contrary Not Withstanding (Y: 68 N: 3 NV: 17 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2013-05-22 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2013-05-03 - Senate - Bussman motion to table Smitherman motion to rerefer (Y: 19 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2013-04-16 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 43 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2013-04-16 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 42 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2013-04-16 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 45 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2013-04-16 - House - Morrow motion to Table (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 38 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2013-04-16 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 42 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2013-04-16 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 45 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2013-04-16 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 38 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2013-04-16 - House - Morrow motion to Table (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 42 Abs: 10) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-20 | House | Assigned Act No. 2013-268. |
2013-05-20 | House | Clerk of the House Certification |
2013-05-20 | House | Second House Concurs in Veto Override |
2013-05-20 | Senate | Fielding motion to Read a Third Time, Veto to the Contrary Not Withstanding adopted Roll Call 1169 |
2013-05-20 | Senate | Marsh motion to pending |
2013-05-20 | Senate | Fielding motion to Reconsider adopted Voice Vote |
2013-05-20 | Senate | Marsh motion to Read a Third Time, Veto to the Contrary Not Withstanding lost Roll Call 1167 |
2013-05-20 | Senate | House of Origin Overrides Veto |
2013-05-20 | Senate | House of Origin Overrides Veto |
2013-05-20 | House | Morrow motion to Read a Third Time, Veto to the Contrary Not Withstanding adopted Roll Call 1241 |
2013-05-20 | House | Governor's Veto Message |
2013-05-20 | House | Forwarded to Governor |
2013-05-20 | House | Clerk of the House Certification |
2013-05-20 | House | Enrolled |
2013-05-20 | Senate | Signature Requested |
2013-05-20 | House | Passed Second House |
2013-05-20 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1059 |
2013-05-20 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2013-05-09 | Senate | Dial table Dial motion to recommit adopted Voice Vote |
2013-05-09 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2013-05-02 | Senate | Bussman motion to table Smitherman motion to rerefer adopted Roll Call 688 |
2013-05-02 | Senate | Smitherman motion to rerefer |
2013-05-02 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Local Legislation No. 1 |
2013-04-16 | House | Engrossed |
2013-04-16 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 503 |
2013-04-16 | House | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 502 |
2013-04-16 | House | Morrow Amendment Offered |
2013-04-16 | House | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 501 |
2013-04-16 | House | Morrow first Substitute Offered |
2013-04-16 | House | Morrow motion to Table adopted Roll Call 500 |
2013-04-16 | House | Local Legislation first Substitute Offered |
2013-04-16 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2013-04-09 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar with 1 substitute and |
2013-03-07 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Local Legislation |