AL HB403 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 7 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-07 - Forwarded to Governor at 10:40 p.m. on April 7, 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 7 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-07 - Forwarded to Governor at 10:40 p.m. on April 7, 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Criminal code, serious physical injury, definition amended to specify that a penetrating gunshot wound is included in the definition, Sec. 13A-1-2 am'd.
Title
Criminal code, serious physical injury, definition amended to specify that a penetrating gunshot wound is included in the definition, Sec. 13A-1-2 am'd.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-07 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 1088 (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2022-03-29 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 762 (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-29 - House - Motion to Adopt Roll Call 761 (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-03-29 - House - HBIR: Morris motion to Adopt Roll Call 760 (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-29 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 762 (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-29 - House - Motion to Adopt Roll Call 761 (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-03-29 - House - HBIR: Morris motion to Adopt Roll Call 760 (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-07 | House | Forwarded to Governor at 10:40 p.m. on April 7, 2022. |
2022-04-07 | House | Assigned Act No. 2022-401. |
2022-04-07 | House | Clerk of the House Certification |
2022-04-07 | Senate | Signature Requested |
2022-04-07 | House | Enrolled |
2022-04-07 | House | Passed Second House |
2022-04-07 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1088 |
2022-04-07 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2022-04-06 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2022-03-30 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Fiscal Responsibility and Economic Development |
2022-03-29 | House | Engrossed |
2022-03-29 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 762 |
2022-03-29 | House | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 761 |
2022-03-29 | House | Jones (M) Amendment Offered |
2022-03-29 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2022-03-09 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2022-02-23 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Judiciary |