AL HB403 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 12-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 11 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-18 - Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Judiciary
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 11 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-18 - Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Judiciary
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Doxing, crime of created, penalties
Title
Doxing, crime of created, penalties
Sponsors
Rep. Shane Stringer [R] | Rep. Chip Brown [R] | Rep. Tracy Estes [R] | Rep. Gil Isbell [R] |
Rep. Craig Lipscomb [R] | Rep. Rhett Marques [R] | Rep. Parker Moore [R] | Rep. Ed Oliver [R] |
Rep. Rex Reynolds [R] | Rep. Matt Simpson [R] | Rep. Jeff Sorrells [R] | Rep. Andy Whitt [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-03-11 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 380 (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-03-11 - House - Motion to Adopt Roll Call 379 (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2021-03-11 - House - Stringer motion to Table Roll Call 378 (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 17 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2021-03-11 - House - HBIR: Stringer motion to Adopt Roll Call 377 (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-03-11 - House - Motion to Adopt Roll Call 379 (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2021-03-11 - House - Stringer motion to Table Roll Call 378 (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 17 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2021-03-11 - House - HBIR: Stringer motion to Adopt Roll Call 377 (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-18 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Judiciary |
2021-03-11 | House | Engrossed |
2021-03-11 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 380 |
2021-03-11 | House | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 379 |
2021-03-11 | House | Wood (R) Amendment Offered |
2021-03-11 | House | Stringer motion to Table adopted Roll Call 378 |
2021-03-11 | House | Judiciary Amendment Offered |
2021-03-11 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2021-02-24 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment |
2021-02-11 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Judiciary |