AL HB402 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 14 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-05-19 - Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Transportation and Energy
Pending: Senate Transportation and Energy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 14 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-05-19 - Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Transportation and Energy
Pending: Senate Transportation and Energy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Fire Departments, non-volunteer, diesel exhaust system installed in the fire station building, required within certain time frame and under certain conditions
Title
Fire Departments, non-volunteer, diesel exhaust system installed in the fire station building, required within certain time frame and under certain conditions
Sponsors
Rep. James Hanes [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-05-14 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 93 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2015-05-14 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 93 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2015-05-14 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 93 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-19 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Transportation and Energy |
2015-05-14 | House | Engrossed |
2015-05-14 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 763 |
2015-05-14 | House | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 762 |
2015-05-14 | House | Public Safety and Homeland Security Amendment Offered |
2015-05-14 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2015-04-16 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment |
2015-04-02 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Public Safety and Homeland Security |