AL HB400 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 23 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-23 - Delivered to Governor at 9:45 a.m. on May 23, 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Telecommunications, Broadband Using Electric Easement Accessibility Act, Secs. 37-16-1 to 37-16-10, inclusive, added.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Telecommunications, Broadband Using Electric Easement Accessibility Act, Secs. 37-16-1 to 37-16-10, inclusive, added.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-22 - House - Shedd motion to Concur In and Adopt (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-05-22 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-05-22 - Senate - Givhan motion to Adopt (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Senate - Livingston motion to Adopt (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-05-02 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 92 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2019-05-02 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2019-05-02 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2019-05-02 - House - Baker motion to Carry Over Temporarily (Y: 29 N: 53 NV: 3 Abs: 19) [FAIL]
2019-05-02 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 84 N: 2 NV: 3 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2019-05-02 - House - Lovvorn motion to Carry Over Temporarily (Y: 33 N: 46 NV: 1 Abs: 24) [FAIL]
2019-05-02 - House - Ingram motion to Carry Over Temporarily (Y: 31 N: 42 NV: 1 Abs: 30) [FAIL]
2019-05-02 - House - Blackshear motion to Carry Over Temporarily (Y: 40 N: 48 NV: 3 Abs: 13) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-23HouseDelivered to Governor at 9:45 a.m. on May 23, 2019.
2019-05-23HouseAssigned Act No. 2019-326.
2019-05-23HouseClerk of the House Certification
2019-05-23SenateSignature Requested
2019-05-23SenateConcurred in Second House Amendment
2019-05-22HouseEnrolled
2019-05-22HouseShedd motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Roll Call 887
2019-05-22HouseConcurrence Requested
2019-05-22SenateMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 990
2019-05-22SenateGivhan motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 989
2019-05-22SenateGivhan Amendment Offered
2019-05-22SenateThird Reading Passed
2019-05-16SenateLivingston motion to Carry Over adopted Voice Vote
2019-05-16SenateLivingston motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 901
2019-05-16SenateLivingston first Substitute Offered
2019-05-16SenateThird Reading Carried Over
2019-05-14SenateRead for the second time and placed on the calendar
2019-05-07SenateRead for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Fiscal Responsibility and Economic Development
2019-05-02HouseEngrossed
2019-05-02HouseMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 515
2019-05-02HouseMotion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 514
2019-05-02HouseShedd Amendment Offered
2019-05-02HouseMotion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 513
2019-05-02HouseJones (M) Amendment Offered
2019-05-02HouseBaker motion to Carry Over Temporarily lost Roll Call 512
2019-05-02HouseFridy intended to vote "Yea"
2019-05-02HouseMotion to Adopt U&RD substitute adopted Roll Call 511
2019-05-02HouseLovvorn motion to Carry Over Temporarily lost Roll Call 510
2019-05-02HouseIngram motion to Carry Over Temporarily lost Roll Call 509
2019-05-02HouseFridy intended to vote "Nay"
2019-05-02HouseBlackshear motion to Carry Over Temporarily lost Roll Call 508
2019-05-02HouseUrban and Rural Development Substitute resumed
2019-05-02HouseThird Reading Passed
2019-05-02HouseShedd motion to Carry Over Temporarily adopted Voice Vote
2019-05-02HouseUrban and Rural Development Substitute Offered
2019-05-02HouseThird Reading Carried Over
2019-04-25HouseRead for the second time and placed on the calendar with 1 substitute and
2019-04-09HouseRead for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Urban and Rural Development

Subjects


Alabama State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/Alison/SESSBillStatusResult.aspx?BILL=HB400&WIN_TYPE=SELECTED_STATUS
Texthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2019RS/PrintFiles/HB400-int.pdf
Amendmenthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2019RS/PrintFiles/199941-1.pdf
Amendmenthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2019RS/PrintFiles/200550-1.pdf
Amendmenthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2019RS/PrintFiles/200530-1.pdf
Amendmenthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2019RS/PrintFiles/201500-2.pdf
Amendmenthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2019RS/PrintFiles/201835-1.pdf
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=615689&VOTE=508&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1074&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=615692&VOTE=509&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1074&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=615702&VOTE=510&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1074&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=615710&VOTE=511&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1074&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=615711&VOTE=512&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1074&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=615713&VOTE=513&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1074&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=615720&VOTE=514&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1074&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=615723&VOTE=515&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1074&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=620596&VOTE=901&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1074&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=621998&VOTE=989&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1074&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=621999&VOTE=990&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1074&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=622151&VOTE=887&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1074&AMDSUB= 

Bill Comments

feedback