AL HB400 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 5 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-05 - Delivered to Governor at 4:33 p.m. on March 5, 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 5 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-05 - Delivered to Governor at 4:33 p.m. on March 5, 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Motor vehicle dealers, licenses, uniform licenses, off-site sales, time to obtain license decreased, surety bond, dealer license tags further provided for, penalties, Secs. 40-12-264, 40-12-390, 40-12-391, 40-12-392, 40-12-395, 40-12-396, 40-12-398, 40-12-400 am'd.
Title
Motor vehicle dealers, licenses, uniform licenses, off-site sales, time to obtain license decreased, surety bond, dealer license tags further provided for, penalties, Secs. 40-12-264, 40-12-390, 40-12-391, 40-12-392, 40-12-395, 40-12-396, 40-12-398, 40-12-400 am'd.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-05 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-02-20 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2014-02-20 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2014-02-20 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2014-02-20 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-05 | House | Delivered to Governor at 4:33 p.m. on March 5, 2014. |
2014-03-05 | House | Assigned Act No. 2014-158. |
2014-03-05 | House | Clerk of the House Certification |
2014-03-05 | Senate | Signature Requested |
2014-03-04 | House | Enrolled |
2014-03-04 | House | Passed Second House |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 672 |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2014-02-26 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2014-02-20 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Finance and Taxation General Fund |
2014-02-20 | House | Engrossed |
2014-02-20 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 378 |
2014-02-20 | House | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 377 |
2014-02-20 | House | Commerce and Small Business Amendment Offered |
2014-02-20 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2014-02-12 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment |
2014-02-04 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Commerce and Small Business |